Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Oscar Félix Villena

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of San Rafael


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Aug 1917BornSalta
30 Nov 194124.2Ordained PriestPriest
26 Jul 196244.9AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Buenos Aires, Argentina
26 Jul 196244.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Musti
16 Sep 196245.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Musti
11 Feb 197052.4AppointedBishop of San Rafael, Argentina
5 Apr 197052.6InstalledBishop of San Rafael, Argentina
11 Apr 197254.6ResignedBishop of San Rafael, Argentina
30 Apr 198264.7AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Rosario, Argentina
7 Apr 199476.6RetiredAuxiliary Bishop of Rosario, Argentina
8 Oct 200487.1DiedBishop Emeritus of San Rafael, Argentina

MicroData Summary for Oscar Félix Villena:
Bishop Oscar Félix Villena (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of San Rafael

  • a priest for 62.8 years
  • a bishop for 42.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1962, Number 147
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 177, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015