Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop José Miguel Medina

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Jujuy

Bishop of Argentina, Military


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
31 Jan 1916BornBuenos Aires
17 Dec 193923.9Ordained PriestPriest
9 Jun 196246.4AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Mendoza, Argentina
9 Jun 196246.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Termessus
12 Aug 196246.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Termessus
8 Sep 196549.6AppointedBishop of Jujuy, Argentina
19 Mar 196650.1InstalledBishop of Jujuy, Argentina
30 Mar 198266.2AppointedBishop of Argentina, Military
7 Jul 198367.4ResignedBishop of Jujuy, Argentina
7 Mar 199074.1DiedBishop Emeritus of Jujuy, Argentina

MicroData Summary for José Miguel Medina:
Bishop José Miguel Medina (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Jujuy

  • a priest for 50.2 years
  • a bishop for 27.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 125, Necrology (back)
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1962, Number 118

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013