Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Eduardo Vicente Mirás

Archbishop Emeritus of Rosario


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Nov 1929 BornBuenos Aires
3 Aug 195222.7Ordained PriestPriest
1 Mar 198454.3AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Buenos Aires, Argentina
1 Mar 198454.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Ambia
27 Apr 198454.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Ambia
20 Nov 199364.0AppointedArchbishop of Rosario, Argentina
11 Mar 199464.3InstalledArchbishop of Rosario, Argentina
22 Dec 200576.1RetiredArchbishop of Rosario, Argentina

MicroData Summary for Eduardo Vicente Mirás:
Archbishop Eduardo Vicente Mirás (born ) Archbishop Emeritus of Rosario

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Rosario.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 22 Dec 2005
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 177, Deceased Cardinals (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.8, 8 Mar 2014; data: 10 Apr 2014