Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Etienne Jean François Le Herpeur

Deceased

Bishop of Martinique (Fort-de-France e Saint Pierre), Antilles


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Feb 1797Born
23 Sep 182023.6Ordained PriestPriest
24 Jul 185053.4SelectedBishop of Martinique (Fort-de-France e Saint Pierre), Antilles
3 Oct 185053.6ConfirmedBishop of Martinique (Fort-de-France e Saint Pierre), Antilles
5 Jan 185153.8Ordained BishopBishop of Martinique (Fort-de-France e Saint Pierre), Antilles
13 Apr 185861.1DiedBishop of Martinique (Fort-de-France e Saint Pierre), Antilles

MicroData Summary for Etienne Jean François Le Herpeur
Bishop Etienne Jean François Le Herpeur (born , died ) Bishop of Martinique (Fort-de-France e Saint Pierre)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCaen, France
Ordained BishopCathedral, Diocese of Bayeux, France

  • a priest for 37.5 years
  • a bishop for 7.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: LC
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 370
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1851, Number 3

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast