Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Diocese of Ambanja

Dioecesis Ambaniaënsis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

  • Rosario Saro Vella, S.D.B., Bishop
  • Ferdinand Botsy, O.F.M. Cap., Bishop Emeritus

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Diocese
  • Elevated: 14 September 1955
  • Metropolitan: Archdiocese of Antsiranana
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: Madagascar
  • Square Kilometers: 34,083 (13,164 Square Miles)
  • Mailing Address: Eveche, B.P. 1, Ambanja 203, Madagascar
  • Telephone: (020)86.501.80

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Prefecture Apostolic of Isole di Mayotta, Nossi-Bé e Comore
4 September 1848ErectedPrefecture Apostolic of Madagascar Prefecture Apostolic of Isole di Mayotta, Nossi-Bé e Comore (erected)
Prefecture Apostolic of Ambanja
14 June 1938Name ChangedPrefecture Apostolic of Isole di Mayotta, Nossi-Bé e Comore Prefecture Apostolic of Ambanja
Vicariate Apostolic of Ambanja
8 March 1951ElevatedPrefecture Apostolic of Ambanja Vicariate Apostolic of Ambanja
Diocese of Ambanja
14 September 1955ElevatedVicariate Apostolic of Ambanja Diocese of Ambanja
5 June 1975Territory LostDiocese of Ambanja Apostolic Administration of Comores (erected)

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Prefecture Apostolic of Ambanja
19509,138365,5922.5%2323397ap1951
Vicariate Apostolic of Ambanja
Diocese of Ambanja
195914,148405,6883.5%13132442ap1960
197021,152562,3693.8%2384052855631ap1971
198026,094469,0005.6%5263184142741ap1981
199038,024582,0006.5%421251,520327220ap1991
199760,157673,0008.9%2723501,203569512ap2000
200065,000790,0008.2%3119501,300536912ap2001
200167,815825,0008.2%2923521,304387112ap2002
200274,596907,5008.2%2925541,381378312ap2003
200382,056998,2508.2%3624601,367368612ap2004
200490,2621,098,0758.2%3422561,6114515112ap2005
2006109,2171,241,0008.8%3119502,1843816612ap2007
2012142,1121,471,0009.7%3443771,8456215713ap2013

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.1, 20 Jul 2013; data: 17 Aug 2013