Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jean de Dieu Raoelison

Bishop of Ambatondrazaka


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
31 Jul 1963 BornArivonimamo
7 Sep 199633.1Ordained PriestPriest
25 Mar 201046.6AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Antananarivo, Madagascar
25 Mar 201046.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Corniculana
13 Jun 201046.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Corniculana
11 Apr 201551.6AppointedBishop of Ambatondrazaka, Madagascar

MicroData Summary for Jean de Dieu Raoelison:
Bishop Jean de Dieu Raoelison (born ) Bishop of Ambatondrazaka

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Ambatondrazaka.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 25 Mar 2010
  • ob/c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 202, Number 16,655
  • ab: Bollettino, 11 Apr 2015

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.4, 21 Mar 2015; Data: 11 Apr 2015