Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Simon Ignatius Cardinal Pimenta

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Bombay, India

Cardinal-Priest of Santa Maria “Regina Mundi” a Torre Spaccata


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Mar 1920Born
21 Dec 194929.8Ordained PriestPriest of Bombay, India
5 Jun 197151.2AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Bombay, India
5 Jun 197151.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Bocconia
29 Jun 197151.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Bocconia
10 Apr 197656.1AppointedArchbishop of Bombay, India
26 Feb 197756.9AppointedCoadjutor Archbishop of Bombay, India
26 Feb 197756.9AppointedTitular Archbishop of Bocconia
11 Sep 197858.5SucceededArchbishop of Bombay, India
28 Jun 198868.3Elevated to Cardinal
28 Jun 198868.3AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Maria “Regina Mundi” a Torre Spaccata
8 Nov 199676.6RetiredArchbishop of Bombay, India
19 Jul 201393.3DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Bombay, India

Note(s): ⁸ Did Not Take Effect

MicroData Summary for Simon Ignatius Pimenta (VIAF: 61495449)
Simon Ignatius Cardinal Pimenta (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Bombay

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMarol, Archdiocese of Bombay
Ordained PriestSt. Peter's, Church, Bandra, Archdiocese of Bombay
Ordained BishopSt. Peter's, Church, Bandra, Archdiocese of Bombay
Death PlaceClergy Home, Bandra, Archdiocese of Bombay
Buried Place (Original)Saint John the Evangelist, Church, Marol, Archdiocese of Bombay

  • a priest for 63.5 years
  • a bishop for 42.0 years
  • a cardinal for 25.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: CB, 19 Jul 2013
  • ob/c2/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 215, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 216, Necrology (back)
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 17, Number 870

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast