Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francis Leo Braganza, S.J. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Baroda


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Jan 1922BornMumbai
21 Nov 195129.8Ordained PriestPriest of Society of Jesus
27 Apr 198765.2AppointedBishop of Baroda, India
29 Jun 198765.4Ordained BishopBishop of Baroda, India
29 Aug 199775.6RetiredBishop of Baroda, India
21 Dec 201189.9DiedBishop Emeritus of Baroda, India

MicroData Summary for Francis Leo Braganza:
Bishop Francis Leo Braganza S.J. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Baroda

  • a priest for 60.1 years
  • a bishop for 24.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: CB, 21 Dec 2011
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 208, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013