Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Thomas Bhalerao, S.J. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Nashik


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Feb 1933BornSangamner
20 Jun 195320.3ProfessedMember of Society of Jesus
27 Mar 196532.1Ordained PriestPriest of Society of Jesus
15 May 198754.2AppointedBishop of Nashik, India
23 Aug 198754.5Ordained BishopBishop of Nashik, India
31 Mar 200774.1ResignedBishop of Nashik, India
13 Feb 201582.0DiedBishop Emeritus of Nashik, India

MicroData Summary for Thomas Bhalerao:
Bishop Thomas Bhalerao S.J. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Nashik

  • a priest for 49.8 years
  • a bishop for 27.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 31 Mar 2007
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 107, Number 9,414
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 215, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • d: CB, 14 Feb 2015

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.3, 8 Feb 2015; Data: 16 Feb 2015