Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Ignatius D’Cunha

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Aurangabad


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Feb 1924BornVasai
7 Mar 195531.0Ordained PriestPriest
6 Feb 198965.0AppointedBishop of Aurangabad, India
3 Apr 198965.1Ordained BishopBishop of Aurangabad, India
20 Jan 199873.9RetiredBishop of Aurangabad, India
11 Oct 200783.6DiedBishop Emeritus of Aurangabad, India

MicroData Summary for Ignatius D’Cunha:
Bishop Ignatius D’Cunha (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Aurangabad

  • a priest for 52.5 years
  • a bishop for 18.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 118, Number 10,571
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 191, Necrology (back)
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 215, Deceased Cardinals (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015