Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Bosco Penha

Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Bombay

Titular Bishop of Maxula Prates


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Jan 1937 BornMumbai
20 Dec 196730.9Ordained PriestPriest of Bombay, India
15 May 198750.3AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Bombay, India
15 May 198750.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Maxula Prates
8 Aug 198750.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Maxula Prates
14 Jan 201275.0RetiredAuxiliary Bishop of Bombay, India

MicroData Summary for Bosco Penha:
Bishop Bosco Penha (born ) Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Bombay

Please contact the Bishop through the Archdiocese of Bombay.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 106, Number 9,261
  • r: Bollettino, 14 Jan 2012

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.3, 27 Sep 2013; data: 30 Sep 2013