Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Edwin Colaço

Bishop Emeritus of Aurangabad, India


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Oct 1937 Born
2 Dec 196427.1Ordained PriestPriest
1 Apr 199557.4AppointedBishop of Amravati, India
30 Jul 199557.8Ordained BishopBishop of Amravati, India
20 Oct 200669.0AppointedBishop of Aurangabad, India
13 May 201577.6RetiredBishop of Aurangabad, India

MicroData Summary for Edwin Colaço
Bishop Edwin Colaço (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Aurangabad

EventPlace
Birth PlaceUttan

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Aurangabad.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ab: Bollettino, 20 Oct 2006
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 144, Number 12,668
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 2011, Page 63
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 215, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • r: Bollettino, 13 May 2015

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast