Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop William Zephyrine Gomes

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Poona, India


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Aug 1916Born
22 Dec 194125.3Ordained PriestPriest of Bombay, India
18 Mar 196144.5AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Bombay, India
18 Mar 196144.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Parlais
21 May 196144.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Parlais
12 Jun 196750.7AppointedBishop of Poona, India
1 Dec 197660.2ResignedBishop of Poona, India
5 Mar 200487.5DiedBishop Emeritus of Poona, India

MicroData Summary for William Zephyrine Gomes
Bishop William Zephyrine Gomes (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Poona

EventPlace
Birth PlaceKarachi

  • a priest for 62.2 years
  • a bishop for 42.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 177, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast