Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Bernard Blasius Moras

Archbishop Emeritus of Bangalore, India


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Aug 1941 Born
6 Dec 196726.3Ordained PriestPriest of Mangalore, India
30 Nov 199655.3AppointedBishop of Belgaum, India
25 Feb 199755.5Ordained BishopBishop of Belgaum, India
22 Jul 200462.9AppointedArchbishop of Bangalore, India
17 Sep 200463.1InstalledArchbishop of Bangalore, India
19 Mar 201876.6RetiredArchbishop of Bangalore, India

MicroData Summary for Bernard Blasius Moras
Archbishop Bernard Blasius Moras (born ) Archbishop Emeritus of Bangalore

EventPlace
Birth PlaceKuppepadavu
Ordained BishopSt. Paul School Field, Belgaum, Diocese of Belgaum

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Bangalore.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 149, Number 12,986
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 215, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • r: Bollettino, 19 Mar 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 5 Jun 2018

Quantcast