Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Ferdinand Joseph Fonseca

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Bombay

Titular Bishop of Aquae in Mauretania


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Dec 1925BornMumbai
5 Dec 195429.0Ordained PriestPriest of Bombay, India
28 Mar 198054.3AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Bombay, India
28 Mar 198054.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Aquae in Mauretania
29 Jun 198054.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Aquae in Mauretania
2 Dec 200075.0RetiredAuxiliary Bishop of Bombay, India
2 Oct 201589.8DiedAuxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Bombay, India

MicroData Summary for Ferdinand Joseph Fonseca:
Bishop Ferdinand Joseph Fonseca (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Bombay

  • a priest for 60.8 years
  • a bishop for 35.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 215, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • d: CB, 2 Oct 2015

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015