Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Agnelo Rufino Gracias

Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Bombay, India

Titular Bishop of Molicunza

Apostolic Administrator of Jullundur


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
30 Jul 1939 Born
21 Dec 196223.3Ordained PriestPriest
13 Mar 200161.6AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Bombay, India
13 Mar 200161.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Molicunza
21 Apr 200161.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Molicunza
30 Jul 201475.0RetiredAuxiliary Bishop of Bombay, India
20 Sep 201879.1AppointedApostolic Administrator of Jullundur, India

MicroData Summary for Agnelo Rufino Gracias
Bishop Agnelo Rufino Gracias (born ) Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Bombay

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMombasa
Ordained BishopDon Bosco High School, Matunga, Archdiocese of Bombay

Please contact the Bishop through the Archdiocese of Bombay.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 163, Number 13,963
  • r: Bollettino, 30 Jul 2014
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 232, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • ab: CB, 20 Sep 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.2.1, 12 Sep 2018; Data: 21 Sep 2018

Quantcast