Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Augusto Álvaro Cardinal da Silva

Deceased

Archbishop of São Salvador da Bahia, Brazil

Cardinal-Priest of Sant’Angelo in Pescheria


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Apr 1876Born
5 Mar 189922.9Ordained PriestPriest of Olinda, Brazil
12 May 191135.0AppointedBishop of Floresta, Brazil
22 Oct 191135.5Ordained BishopBishop of Floresta, Brazil
23 Nov 191135.6InstalledBishop of Floresta, Brazil
25 Jun 191539.2AppointedBishop of Barra (do Rio Grande), Bahia, Brazil
22 Nov 191539.6InstalledBishop of Barra (do Rio Grande), Bahia, Brazil
18 Dec 192448.6AppointedArchbishop of São Salvador da Bahia, Brazil
20 May 192549.1InstalledArchbishop of São Salvador da Bahia, Brazil
12 Jan 195376.7Elevated to Cardinal
15 Jan 195376.7AppointedCardinal-Priest of Sant’Angelo in Pescheria
14 Aug 196892.3DiedArchbishop of São Salvador da Bahia, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Augusto Álvaro da Silva
Augusto Álvaro Cardinal da Silva (born , died ) Archbishop of São Salvador da Bahia

EventPlace
Birth PlaceRecife

  • a priest for 69.4 years
  • a bishop for 56.8 years
  • a cardinal for 15.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 9, Page 80
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1911, Number 79
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast