Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Edilberto Dinkelborg, O.F.M. †

Deceased

Bishop of Oeiras-Floriano, Piaui


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Nov 1918BornEpe, Germany
19 Jun 194324.6Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor
20 Jun 195940.6AppointedBishop of Oeiras, Brazil
11 Oct 195940.9Ordained BishopBishop of Oeiras, Brazil
31 Dec 199173.1DiedBishop of Oeiras-Floriano, Piaui, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Edilberto Dinkelborg:
Bishop Edilberto Dinkelborg O.F.M. (born , died ) Bishop of Oeiras-Floriano

  • a priest for 48.5 years
  • a bishop for 32.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 129
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1959, Number 87

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013