Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Constantino José Lüers, O.F.M. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Penedo, Alagoas, Brazil


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Apr 1916Born
7 Apr 194124.9Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor
13 Apr 197356.9AppointedPrelate of Óbidos, Para, Brazil
13 Apr 197356.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Valliposita
17 Jun 197357.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Valliposita
24 Mar 197659.9AppointedBishop of Penedo, Alagoas, Brazil
26 Jan 199477.7RetiredBishop of Penedo, Alagoas, Brazil
2 Jul 199781.1DiedBishop Emeritus of Penedo, Alagoas, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Constantino José Lüers
Bishop Constantino José Lüers O.F.M. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Penedo

EventPlace
Birth PlaceHoltrup, Germany
Ordained BishopSainte Anne, Cathedral, Óbidos, Territorial Prelature of Óbidos, Para

  • a priest for 56.2 years
  • a bishop for 24.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 116
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 151, Necrology (back)
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 21, Number 1,197

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast