Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Diocese of Santarém

Dioecesis Santaremensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

  • Flávio Giovenale, S.D.B., Bishop

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Diocese
  • Elevated: 16 October 1979
  • Metropolitan: Archdiocese of Belém do Pará
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • State: Para
  • Country: Brazil
  • Square Kilometers: 171,906 (66,398 Square Miles)
  • Conference Region: Norte II
  • Mailing Address: Curia Diocesana, C.P. 133, Praca Mons. Jose Gregorio 453, 68100-970 Santarem, PA, Brazil
  • Telephone: (093)3522-1668
  • Fax: 3522-6110

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Territorial Prelature of Santarém
21 September 1903ErectedDiocese of Belém do Pará Territorial Prelature of Santarém (erected)
16 August 1934Territory LostArchdiocese of Belém do Pará
Territorial Prelature of Santíssima Conceição do Araguaia
Territorial Prelature of Santarém
Territorial Prelature of Xingu (erected)
1 February 1949Territory LostTerritorial Prelature of Santarém Territorial Prelature of Macapá (erected)
10 April 1957Territory LostTerritorial Prelature of Santarém Territorial Prelature of Óbidos (erected)
Diocese of Santarém
16 October 1979ElevatedTerritorial Prelature of Santarém Diocese of Santarém
6 July 1988Territory LostDiocese of Santarém Territorial Prelature of Itaituba (erected)

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Territorial Prelature of Santarém
1950162,000190,00085.3%232344,764366518ap1951
1965167,472170,88998.0%334374,5265410112ap1967
1970164,900172,63095.5%237394,228378613ap1971
1976257,155270,69095.0%40406,428567313ap1977
Diocese of Santarém
1980279,000284,00098.2%230328,7181505513ap1981
1990465,855517,61790.0%9223115,027403912ap1991
1999367,054458,81880.0%1822409,176354316ap2000
2000378,065472,58280.0%2122438,792323817ap2001
2001342,284488,97870.0%2222447,779324117ap2002
2002342,284488,97870.0%2416408,557293419ap2003
2003279,386488,97857.1%2620466,073283219ap2004
2004203,468415,24249.0%2121424,844343821ap2005
2010295,936447,00066.2%2519446,725304823ap2011

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.0, 19 Jun 2013; data: 22 Jun 2013