Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Juvéncio de Brito

Deceased

Bishop of Garanhuns, Pernambuco


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Aug 1886BornCanindé
20 Nov 191024.2Ordained PriestPriest
23 Dec 192640.3AppointedBishop of Caetité, Bahia, Brazil
12 Jun 192740.8Ordained BishopBishop of Caetité, Bahia, Brazil
15 Dec 194559.3AppointedBishop of Garanhuns, Pernambuco, Brazil
31 Jan 195467.4DiedBishop of Garanhuns, Pernambuco, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Juvéncio de Brito:
Bishop Juvéncio de Brito (born , died ) Bishop of Garanhuns

  • a priest for 43.1 years
  • a bishop for 26.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1927, Number 35

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015