Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop João Floriano Loewenau, O.F.M. †

Deceased

Prelate Emeritus of Óbidos, Para

Titular Bishop of Drivastum


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 May 1912BornSnopken, Poland
22 May 193725.0Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor
8 Sep 195038.3AppointedPrelate of Santarém, Para, Brazil
8 Sep 195038.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Drivastum
26 Nov 195038.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Drivastum
12 Sep 195745.3AppointedPrelate of Óbidos, Para, Brazil
1972²59.6ResignedPrelate of Óbidos, Para, Brazil
4 Jun 197967.0DiedPrelate Emeritus of Óbidos, Para, Brazil

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for João Floriano Loewenau:
Bishop João Floriano Loewenau O.F.M. (born , died ) Prelate Emeritus of Óbidos

  • a priest for 42.0 years
  • a bishop for 28.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1950, Number 98

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013