Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Juan Alberto de la Merced Martín y Villaverde

Deceased

Bishop of Matanzas


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 May 1904BornLa Habana
27 Oct 192723.5Ordained PriestPriest
14 May 193834.0AppointedBishop of Matanzas, Cuba
3 Jul 193834.2Ordained BishopBishop of Matanzas, Cuba
3 Nov 196056.5DiedBishop of Matanzas, Cuba

MicroData Summary for Juan Alberto de la Merced Martín y Villaverde:
Bishop Juan Alberto de la Merced Martín y Villaverde (born , died ) Bishop of Matanzas

  • a priest for 33.0 years
  • a bishop for 22.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 160, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1938, Number 51

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013