Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Severiano Sainz y Bencamo

Deceased

Bishop of Matanzas, Cuba


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Nov 1871Born
23 Dec 189827.1Ordained PriestPriest of San Cristobal de la Habana, Cuba
11 Feb 191543.2AppointedBishop of Matanzas, Cuba
3 May 191543.4Ordained BishopBishop of Matanzas, Cuba
14 Mar 193765.3DiedBishop of Matanzas, Cuba

MicroData Summary for Severiano Sainz y Bencamo
Bishop Severiano Sainz y Bencamo (born , died ) Bishop of Matanzas

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSan Juan y Martínez

  • a priest for 38.2 years
  • a bishop for 21.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob: Annuaire Pontifical Catholique, Year 1932
  • c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 159, Number 13,735
  • bd/op: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 160, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1915, Number 26

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast