Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Ignatius Mummadi

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Guntur, India


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Mar 1899Born
3 Dec 192526.7Ordained PriestPriest
13 Jul 194344.3AppointedBishop of Guntur, India
28 Oct 194344.6Ordained BishopBishop of Guntur, India
26 Nov 197374.7RetiredBishop of Guntur, India
2 Apr 198384.0DiedBishop Emeritus of Guntur, India

MicroData Summary for Ignatius Mummadi
Bishop Ignatius Mummadi (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Guntur

EventPlace
Birth PlaceNagarajupalle
Ordained BishopGuntur, Diocese of Guntur

  • a priest for 57.3 years
  • a bishop for 39.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1943, Number 68
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 52, Number 3,716

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast