Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Joseph Alexander Fernandes

Deceased

Archbishop of Delhi, India


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Apr 1889Born
19 Dec 191425.6Ordained PriestPriest
24 Jan 194959.7AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Calcutta, India
24 Jan 194959.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Aphnaeum
1 May 194960.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Aphnaeum
12 Apr 195162.0AppointedArchbishop of Delhi and Simla, India
16 Sep 196778.4DiedArchbishop of Delhi, India

MicroData Summary for Joseph Alexander Fernandes
Archbishop Joseph Alexander Fernandes (born , died ) Archbishop of Delhi

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBangalore
Ordained BishopCalcutta, Archdiocese of Calcutta

  • a priest for 52.7 years
  • a bishop for 18.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1949, Number 28
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 52, Number 3,717

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast