Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Ignatius Philip Trigueros Glennie, S.J. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Trincomalee-Batticaloa, Sri Lanka


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Feb 1907Born
21 Nov 193831.7Ordained PriestPriest of Society of Jesus
10 Jul 194740.4AppointedBishop of Trincomalee, Sri Lanka
21 Sep 194740.6Ordained BishopBishop of Trincomalee, Sri Lanka
15 Feb 197467.0ResignedBishop of Trincomalee-Batticaloa, Sri Lanka
27 Apr 199386.2DiedBishop Emeritus of Trincomalee-Batticaloa, Sri Lanka

MicroData Summary for Ignatius Philip Trigueros Glennie
Bishop Ignatius Philip Trigueros Glennie S.J. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Trincomalee-Batticaloa

EventPlace
Birth PlaceDurango, México

  • a priest for 54.4 years
  • a bishop for 45.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: CB
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 138, Necrology (back)
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1947, Number 96
  • bd: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1993, Page 705

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018