Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Reinhard Pappenberger

Auxiliary Bishop of Regensburg

Titular Bishop of Aptuca


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
30 Jun 1958 BornGrafenwöhr
29 Jun 198526.9Ordained PriestPriest of Regensburg, Germany
6 Feb 200748.6AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Regensburg, Germany
6 Feb 200748.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Aptuca
25 Mar 200748.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Aptuca

MicroData Summary for Reinhard Pappenberger:
Bishop Reinhard Pappenberger (born ) Auxiliary Bishop of Regensburg

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Regensburg.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 6 Feb 2007
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 188, Number 15,358

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.6, 2 May 2015; Data: 2 Jun 2015