Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Wilhelm Schraml

Bishop Emeritus of Passau


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Jun 1935 BornErbendorf
29 Jun 196126.0Ordained PriestPriest of Regensburg, Germany
7 Jan 198650.5AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Regensburg, Germany
7 Jan 198650.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Munatiana
8 Mar 198650.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Munatiana
13 Dec 200166.5AppointedBishop of Passau, Germany
23 Feb 200266.7InstalledBishop of Passau, Germany
1 Oct 201277.3RetiredBishop of Passau, Germany

MicroData Summary for Wilhelm Schraml:
Bishop Wilhelm Schraml (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Passau

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Passau.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 1 Oct 2012

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013