Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Josef Graf

Auxiliary Bishop of Regensburg, Germany

Titular Bishop of Inis Cathaig


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
30 Jun 1957 Born
10 Oct 198326.2Ordained PriestPriest of Regensburg, Germany
24 Apr 201557.8AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Regensburg, Germany
24 Apr 201557.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Inis Cathaig
7 Jun 201557.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Inis Cathaig

MicroData Summary for Josef Graf
Bishop Josef Graf (born ) Auxiliary Bishop of Regensburg

EventPlace
Birth PlaceRiedenburg

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Regensburg.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 24 Apr 2015
  • ob: CB, 28 Apr 2015
  • c2+: CB, 1 Jun 2015
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 223, Number 18,500

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast