Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Farly Yovany Gil Betancur

Bishop of Montelibano, Colombia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Jun 1974 Born
21 Nov 200026.3Ordained PriestPriest of Santa Rosa de Osos, Colombia
4 Mar 202045.6AppointedBishop of Montelibano, Colombia
18 Jun 202045.9Ordained BishopBishop of Montelibano, Colombia
24 Jun 202045.9InstalledBishop of Montelibano, Colombia

MicroData Summary for Farly Yovany Gil Betancur
Bishop Farly Yovany Gil Betancur (born ) Bishop of Montelibano

EventPlace
Birth PlaceDonmatías, Diocese of Santa Rosa de Osos
Ordained BishopNuestra Señora del Rosario de Chiquinquirá, Cathedral, Santa Rosa de Osos, Diocese of Santa Rosa de Osos

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Montelibano.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 4 Mar 2020
  • op: CB, 5 Mar 2020
  • ob/i: CB, 27 Apr 2020
  • c2+: CB, 9 Jun 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.9, 13 Apr 2020; Data: 24 Jun 2020

Quantcast