Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archdiocese of Florencia

Archidioecesis Florentiae



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)


Suffragan Dioceses

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Archdiocese
  • Elevated: 13 July 2019
  • Metropolitan See
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: Colombia
  • Square Kilometers: 15,441 (5,964 Square Miles)
  • Official Web Site: http://www.diocesisflorencia.org/
  • Mailing Address: Curia Diocesana, Carrera 14 N. 13-35, Parque San Francisco, Florencia, Caqueta, Colombia
  • Telephone: (8)435.8655
  • Fax: 435.2528

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Vicariate Apostolic of Florencia
8 February 1951ErectedVicariate Apostolic of Caquetá Vicariate Apostolic of Florencia (erected)
Prefecture Apostolic of Leticia (erected)
Vicariate Apostolic of Sibundoy (erected)
9 December 1985Territory LostVicariate Apostolic of Florencia Vicariate Apostolic of San Vicente-Puerto Leguízamo (erected)
Diocese of Florencia
9 December 1985ElevatedVicariate Apostolic of Florencia Diocese of Florencia
Archdiocese of Florencia
13 July 2019ElevatedDiocese of Florencia Archdiocese of Florencia
Diocese of San Vicente del Caguán (from Ibagué)

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Vicariate Apostolic of Florencia
1966160,950165,50997.2%326295,550356223ap1967
1968180,000187,00096.3%332355,142397019ap1971
1976210,000225,00093.3%1033434,883339723ap1977
1980245,000295,00083.1%834425,833359224ap1981
Diocese of Florencia
1990280,000300,00093.3%229319,03299023ap1991
1999225,000260,00086.5%403435,23235626ap2000
2000225,000260,00086.5%413445,11336726ap2001
2001225,000260,00086.5%443474,78736727ap2002
2002222,000255,00087.1%393425,28536127ap2003
2003222,000255,00087.1%372395,692325928ap2004
2004222,500256,00086.9%402425,297325928ap2005
2006222,800260,00085.7%404445,063347330ap2007
2013245,000283,00086.6%483514,803336133ap2014
2016253,849292,28086.9%522544,700325633ap2017
Archdiocese of Florencia

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_d, v3.2.9, 9 Jun 2019; Data: 13 Jul 2019

Quantcast