Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Jaime Lucas Cardinal Ortega y Alamino

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of San Cristobal de la Habana, Cuba

Cardinal-Priest of Santi Aquila e Priscilla


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Oct 1936Born
2 Aug 196427.7Ordained PriestPriest of Matanzas, Cuba
4 Dec 197842.1AppointedBishop of Pinar del Rio, Cuba
14 Jan 197942.2Ordained BishopBishop of Pinar del Rio, Cuba
21 Jan 197942.2InstalledBishop of Pinar del Rio, Cuba
20 Nov 198145.0AppointedArchbishop of San Cristobal de la Habana, Cuba
26 Nov 199458.1Elevated to Cardinal
26 Nov 199458.1AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santi Aquila e Priscilla
26 Apr 201679.5RetiredArchbishop of San Cristobal de la Habana, Cuba
26 Jul 201982.7DiedArchbishop Emeritus of San Cristobal de la Habana, Cuba

MicroData Summary for Jaime Lucas Ortega y Alamino (VIAF: 87315871)
Jaime Lucas Cardinal Ortega y Alamino (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of San Cristobal de la Habana

EventPlace
Birth PlaceJagüey Grande, Diocese of Matanzas
Ordained PriestSan Carlos Borromeo, Cathedral, Matanzas, Diocese of Matanzas
Ordained BishopSan Carlos Borromeo, Cathedral, Matanzas, Diocese of Matanzas
Death PlaceHavana, Archdiocese of San Cristobal de la Habana

  • a priest for 54.9 years
  • a bishop for 40.5 years
  • a cardinal for 24.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 26 Apr 2016
  • d: CB, 26 Jul 2019
  • ob/c2/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 241, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 242, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast