Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Álvaro Julio Beyra Luarca

Bishop of Santisimo Salvador de Bayamo y Manzanillo, Cuba


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 May 1945 Born
24 Feb 199448.7Ordained PriestPriest of Camagüey, Cuba
9 Jul 200762.1AppointedBishop of Santisimo Salvador de Bayamo y Manzanillo, Cuba
25 Aug 200762.2Ordained BishopBishop of Santisimo Salvador de Bayamo y Manzanillo, Cuba

MicroData Summary for Álvaro Julio Beyra Luarca
Bishop Álvaro Julio Beyra Luarca (born ) Bishop of Santisimo Salvador de Bayamo y Manzanillo

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCamagüey

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Santisimo Salvador de Bayamo y Manzanillo.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 9 Jul 2007
  • ob/c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 190, Number 15,492

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast