Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Atanáz Orosz

Bishop of Miskolc (Hungarian), Hungary


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 May 1960 Born
4 Aug 198525.2Ordained PriestPriest of Hajdúdorog (Hungarian), Hungary
19 Jul 199636.1ProfessedPriest of Order of Saint Benedict
1999²38.6IncardinatedPriest of Hajdúdorog (Hungarian), Hungary
5 Mar 201150.8AppointedApostolic Exarch of Miskolc (Hungarian), Hungary
5 Mar 201150.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Panium
21 May 201151.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Panium
20 Mar 201554.8AppointedBishop of Miskolc (Hungarian), Hungary
20 Mar 201554.8AppointedApostolic Administrator of Nyíregyháza (Hungarian), Hungary
31 Oct 201555.4CeasedApostolic Administrator of Nyíregyháza (Hungarian), Hungary

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Atanáz Orosz
Bishop Atanáz Orosz (born ) Bishop of Miskolc

EventPlace
Birth PlaceNyíregyháza
Ordained BishopDormition de la Mčre de Dieu, Miskolc, Apostolic Exarchate of Miskolc (Hungarian)

Please contact the Bishop through the Eparchy of Miskolc (Hungarian).

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 5 Mar 2011
  • ob/c2+: CB, 7 May 2011
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 206, Number 17,061
  • ab: Bollettino, 20 Mar 2015
  • prof: CB, 6 Nov 2017

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018