Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Péter Fülöp Kocsis

Archbishop of Hajdúdorog (Hungarian)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Jan 1963 BornSzeged
2 Aug 198926.5Ordained PriestPriest
2 May 200845.3AppointedBishop of Hajdúdorog (Hungarian), Hungary
2 May 200845.3AppointedApostolic Administrator of Miskolc (Hungarian), Hungary
30 Jun 200845.4Ordained BishopBishop of Hajdúdorog (Hungarian), Hungary
5 Mar 201148.1ResignedApostolic Administrator of Miskolc (Hungarian), Hungary
20 Mar 201552.1AppointedArchbishop of Hajdúdorog (Hungarian), Hungary

MicroData Summary for Péter Fülöp Kocsis:
Archbishop Péter Fülöp Kocsis (born ) Archbishop of Hajdúdorog

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Hajdúdorog (Hungarian).

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 2 May 2008
  • ob/c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 194, Number 15,773
  • ab: Bollettino, 20 Mar 2015

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.3, 8 Feb 2015; Data: 20 Mar 2015