Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Monsignor Thomas Warren Powers

Rector of the Pontifical North American College

Priest of Bridgeport, Connecticut


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Feb 1965³ Born
3 Oct 199631.6Ordained DeaconDeacon of Bridgeport, Connecticut, USA
24 May 199732.2Ordained PriestPriest of Bridgeport, Connecticut, USA
30 Mar 202257.1AppointedRector of the Pontifical North American College
1 Jul 202257.3InstalledRector of the Pontifical North American College

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary
Thomas Warren Powers
Monsignor Thomas Warren Powers
(born )
Rector of Pontifical North American College

EventPlace
Birth PlaceNewtown, CT, Diocese of Bridgeport, Connecticut, USA
Ordained DeaconSan Pietro, Basilica, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

Please contact the Monsignor through the Pontifical North American College.

  • a priest for years

External Link(s):

Source(s):
  • od/c0/bd: CB, 29 Apr 2025

============

Home | Countries | Religious Men Women | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2025
Code: web_b, v3.4.1, 22 Mar 2025; Data: 29 Apr 2025