Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Frank Richard Spencer

Auxiliary Bishop of United States of America, Military

Titular Bishop of Auzia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Jun 1951 Born
14 May 198836.9Ordained PriestPriest of Baltimore, Maryland, USA
22 May 201058.9AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of United States of America, Military
22 May 201058.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Auzia
8 Sep 201059.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Auzia

MicroData Summary for Frank Richard Spencer
Bishop Frank Richard Spencer (born ) Auxiliary Bishop of United States of America, Military

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSylacauga, AL

Please contact the Bishop through the Military Ordinariate of United States of America, Military.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 22 May 2010
  • ob/c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 203, Number 16,784

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018