Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop David Leon Toups

Bishop of Beaumont, Texas, USA


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Mar 1971 Born
3 Oct 199625.5Ordained DeaconDeacon of Saint Petersburg, Florida, USA
14 Jun 199726.2Ordained PriestPriest of Saint Petersburg, Florida, USA
9 Jun 202049.2AppointedBishop of Beaumont, Texas, USA
21 Aug 202049.4Ordained BishopBishop of Beaumont, Texas, USA

MicroData Summary for David Leon Toups (VIAF: 290834708)
Bishop David Leon Toups (born ) Bishop of Beaumont

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSeattle, Archdiocese of Seattle, Washington
Ordained DeaconSan Pietro, Basilica, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy
Ordained PriestSt. Jude the Apostle, Cathedral, Saint Petersburg, Diocese of Saint Petersburg, Florida
Ordained BishopSt. Anthony, Cathedral Basilica, Beaumont, Diocese of Beaumont, Texas

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Beaumont.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 9 Jun 2020
  • ob: CB, 9 Jun 2020
  • c2+: CB, 31 Jul 2020
  • od: CB, 2 Aug 2020
  • c01: CB, 3 Aug 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.9, 13 Apr 2020; Data: 22 Aug 2020

Quantcast