Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Adam John Parker

Auxiliary Bishop of Baltimore, Maryland, USA

Titular Bishop of Tasaccora


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Jan 1972 Born
27 May 200028.3Ordained PriestPriest of Baltimore, Maryland, USA
5 Dec 201644.8AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Baltimore, Maryland, USA
5 Dec 201644.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Tasaccora
19 Jan 201745.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Tasaccora

MicroData Summary for Adam John Parker
Bishop Adam John Parker (born ) Auxiliary Bishop of Baltimore

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCleveland, OH, Diocese of Cleveland, Ohio
Ordained BishopMary Our Queen, Cathedral, Baltimore, Archdiocese of Baltimore, Maryland

Please contact the Bishop through the Archdiocese of Baltimore.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 5 Dec 2016
  • ob/c2: CB, 5 Dec 2016
  • c134: CB, 14 Jan 2017

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 20 Jan 2017