Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop David Edward Foley

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Birmingham, Alabama, USA


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Feb 1930Born
26 May 195626.3Ordained PriestPriest of Washington, District of Columbia, USA
3 May 198656.2AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Richmond, Virginia, USA
3 May 198656.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Octaba
27 Jun 198656.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Octaba
22 Mar 199464.1AppointedBishop of Birmingham, Alabama, USA
13 May 199464.2InstalledBishop of Birmingham, Alabama, USA
10 May 200575.2RetiredBishop of Birmingham, Alabama, USA
17 Apr 201888.2DiedBishop Emeritus of Birmingham, Alabama, USA

MicroData Summary for David Edward Foley
Bishop David Edward Foley (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Birmingham

EventPlace
Birth PlaceWorcester
Death PlaceSt. John Vianney Residence for Priests, Birmingham, Diocese of Birmingham, Alabama
Buried Place (Original)Courtyard, St. Paul, Cathedral, Birmingham, Diocese of Birmingham, Alabama

  • a priest for 61.8 years
  • a bishop for 31.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast