Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Carlo Angeleri

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Tortona, Italy

Titular Bishop of Ptolemais in Libya


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Feb 1894Born
21 May 192127.2Ordained PriestPriest
7 Aug 194854.5AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Tortona, Italy
7 Aug 194854.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Ptolemais in Libya
10 Oct 194854.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Ptolemais in Libya
22 May 197985.2DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Tortona, Italy

MicroData Summary for Carlo Angeleri
Bishop Carlo Angeleri (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Tortona

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSilvano Pietra

  • a priest for 58.0 years
  • a bishop for 30.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1948, Number 109

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast