Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Laurent Michel Camiade

Bishop of Cahors


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Nov 1966 BornAgen
28 Jun 199225.5Ordained PriestPriest of Agen, France
15 Jul 201548.6AppointedBishop of Cahors, France
4 Oct 201548.8Ordained BishopBishop of Cahors, France

MicroData Summary for Laurent Michel Camiade:
Bishop Laurent Michel Camiade (born ) Bishop of Cahors

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Cahors.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 15 Jul 2015
  • ob: CB, 15 Jul 2015
  • mn: CB, 29 Jul 2015
  • c2+: CB, 23 Sep 2015
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 224, Number 18,585

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015