Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Stefan Moskwa

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Przemyśl, Poland

Titular Bishop of Giru Mons


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 Sep 1935Born
7 Jun 195923.6Ordained PriestPriest of Przemyśl, Poland
30 Nov 198348.1AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Przemyśl, Poland
30 Nov 198348.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Giru Mons
8 Jan 198448.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Giru Mons
18 Oct 200469.0DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Przemyśl, Poland

MicroData Summary for Stefan Moskwa
Bishop Stefan Moskwa (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Przemyśl

EventPlace
Birth PlaceWola Mala
Ordained BishopSt. John the Baptist, Cathedral, Przemyśl, Diocese of Przemyśl

  • a priest for 45.3 years
  • a bishop for 20.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 177, Necrology (back)
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 86, Number 7,192

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast