Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Adam Szal

Archbishop of Przemyśl


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Dec 1953 BornWysoka Lancucka
31 May 197925.4Ordained PriestPriest of Przemyśl, Poland
16 Nov 200046.8AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Przemyśl, Poland
16 Nov 200046.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Lavellum
23 Dec 200046.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Lavellum
30 Apr 201662.3AppointedArchbishop of Przemyśl, Poland
21 May 201662.4InstalledArchbishop of Przemyśl, Poland

MicroData Summary for Adam Szal
Archbishop Adam Szal (born ) Archbishop of Przemyśl

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Przemyśl.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 161, Number 13,872
  • ab: Bollettino, 30 Apr 2016

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 21 May 2016