Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Edward Marian Frankowski

Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Sandomierz

Titular Bishop of Tigamibena


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Aug 1937 BornKepa Rzeczycka
18 Jun 196123.8Ordained PriestPriest of Sandomierz-Radom, Poland
16 Feb 198951.5AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Przemyśl, Poland
16 Feb 198951.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Tigamibena
5 Mar 198951.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Tigamibena
25 Mar 199254.6AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Sandomierz, Poland
6 Oct 201275.1RetiredAuxiliary Bishop of Sandomierz, Poland

MicroData Summary for Edward Marian Frankowski:
Bishop Edward Marian Frankowski (born ) Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Sandomierz

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Sandomierz.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 124, Number 11,177
  • r: Bollettino, 6 Oct 2012

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013