Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Bernard James Sullivan, S.J. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Patna

Titular Bishop of Halicarnassus


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Mar 1889BornTrinidad, CO, USA
26 Jun 192132.3Ordained PriestPriest of Society of Jesus
15 Jan 192939.8AppointedBishop of Patna, India
17 Mar 192940.0Ordained BishopBishop of Patna, India
4 Jun 194657.2ResignedBishop of Patna, India
4 Jun 194657.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Halicarnassus
16 May 197081.1DiedBishop Emeritus of Patna, India

MicroData Summary for Bernard James Sullivan:
Bishop Bernard James Sullivan S.J. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Patna

  • a priest for 48.9 years
  • a bishop for 41.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2: Annuaire Pontifical Catholique, Year 1939
  • obp: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 113, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1929, Number 21

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013