Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Stephen Stanislaus Woznicki

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Saginaw, Michigan, USA

Titular Bishop of Thiava


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Aug 1894Born
22 Dec 191723.3Ordained PriestPriest of Detroit, Michigan, USA
13 Dec 193743.3AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Detroit, Michigan, USA
13 Dec 193743.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Peltae
25 Jan 193843.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Peltae
28 Mar 195055.6AppointedBishop of Saginaw, Michigan, USA
28 Oct 196874.1ResignedBishop of Saginaw, Michigan, USA
28 Oct 196874.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Thiava
10 Dec 196874.3DiedBishop Emeritus of Saginaw, Michigan, USA

MicroData Summary for Stephen Stanislaus Woznicki
Bishop Stephen Stanislaus Woznicki (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Saginaw

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMiners Mills, PA

  • a priest for 50.9 years
  • a bishop for 30.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1938, Number 4

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 28 Mar 2017