Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Walter Joseph Schoenherr

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Detroit, Michigan, USA

Titular Bishop of Timidana


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Feb 1920Born
27 Oct 194525.6Ordained PriestPriest of Detroit, Michigan, USA
8 Mar 196848.0AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Detroit, Michigan, USA
8 Mar 196848.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Timidana
1 May 196848.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Timidana
7 Mar 199575.0RetiredAuxiliary Bishop of Detroit, Michigan, USA
27 Apr 200787.1DiedAuxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Detroit, Michigan, USA

MicroData Summary for Walter Joseph Schoenherr
Bishop Walter Joseph Schoenherr (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Detroit

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCenter Line
Ordained BishopDetroit, Archdiocese of Detroit, Michigan
Death PlaceLivonia
Buried Place (Original)Holy Sepulchre, Cemetery, Southfield

  • a priest for 61.5 years
  • a bishop for 38.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 110, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 191, Necrology (back)
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 10, Number 482

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast