Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Walter Andrew Foery

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Syracuse, New York, USA


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Jul 1890Born
10 Jun 191625.9Ordained PriestPriest of Rochester, New York, USA
26 May 193746.8AppointedBishop of Syracuse, New York, USA
18 Aug 193747.1Ordained BishopBishop of Syracuse, New York, USA
4 Aug 197080.0RetiredBishop of Syracuse, New York, USA
4 Aug 197080.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Misenum
31 Dec 197080.4ResignedTitular Bishop of Misenum
10 May 197887.8DiedBishop Emeritus of Syracuse, New York, USA

MicroData Summary for Walter Andrew Foery
Bishop Walter Andrew Foery (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Syracuse

EventPlace
Birth PlaceRochester

  • a priest for 61.9 years
  • a bishop for 40.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1937, Number 46

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018